EP1014666 - Method for setting up of multipoint connections between plural terminals in a H.323 data communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co. KG Hofmannstrasse 51 81379 München / DE | [2011/19] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaghofer, Karl Krüner Strasse 12 81373 München / DE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124133.2 | 02.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1998159163 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859163 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014666 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/56 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04L65/1106 (EP,US);
H04L65/1093 (EP,US);
H04L65/4038 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5018 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Realisieren von Multipunktverbindungen zwischen mehreren Endgeräten eines H.323-Datenkommunikationsnetzes | [2000/26] | English: | Method for setting up of multipoint connections between plural terminals in a H.323 data communication network | [2000/26] | French: | Procédé pour réaliser des connections multipoints entre plusieurs terminaux d'un réseau de communication de données H.323 | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/41] | 06.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2011 | 29.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2000 | Request for further processing for: | 23.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KYUNG HEE LEE ET AL., "An Implementation of Control Protocol for Multipoint Audio-Video Teleconferencing Systems", PROCEEDINGS TWELFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION NETWORKING ICOIN-12, Tokyo, (19980121), pages 38 - 41, XP002136005 [A] 1,2 | [A] - G.A. THOM, "H. 323: The Multimedia Communications Standard for Local Area Networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (199612), pages 52 - 56, XP000636454 [A] 1,2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.556487 | [A] - S. OKUBO ET AL., "ITU-T Standardization of Audiovisual Communication Systems in ATM and LAN Environments", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (199708), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 965 - 982, XP000749687 [A] 1,2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.611153 |