EP1016593 - Cigarette package and method and apparatus for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Blome, Hermann Büssenschütt-Strasse 21 27337 Blender-Einste / DE | 03 /
Roesler, Burkard Ritzenberger Weg 17 27337 Blender / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124165.4 | 03.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | DE1998159949 | 28.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859949 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016593 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016593 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/22, B65B19/28 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B65B19/221 (EP,US);
B65B19/228 (EP,US);
B65B19/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2001/17] |
Former [2001/12] | |||
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zigarettenpackung sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen derselben | [2000/27] | English: | Cigarette package and method and apparatus for its manufacture | [2000/27] | French: | Paquet de cigarettes ainsi que procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 23.11.2000 | Observations by third parties | 27.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB200655 (WALTER EVERETT MOLINS) [X] 1,3,5 * page 1, lines 1-54; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [DY]DE1288970 (MOLINS ORGANISATION LTD) [DY] 7 * column 4, lines 15-28; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0443787 (MOLINS PLC [GB]) [Y] 8 * column 8, lines 17-41; figures 1,5 *; | [A]GB165891 (WALTER EVERETT MOLINS) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2259193 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 7 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,4 * | other | DE1757190 | DE1761160 |