EP1052350 - Escutcheon for doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlosssicherungen Gera GmbH Wiesestrasse 190 07548 Gera / DE | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riesel, Michael Forstweg 38 07570 Weida / DE | 02 /
Hecht, Rosemarie Karl-Wetzel-Strasse 38 07549 Gera / DE | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Weidelt, Manfred Meissner, Bolte & Partner Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15 07545 Gera / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Weidelt, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Patentanwalt, Ruckdeschelstrasse 17 07551 Gera / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124261.1 | 04.12.1999 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | DE1999208486U | 12.05.1999 Original published format: DE 29908486 U | [2000/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052350 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052350 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/02, E05B17/04 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
E05B15/02 (EP);
E05B63/006 (EP);
E05B63/0034 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2001/26] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schutzbeschlag für Türen | [2000/46] | English: | Escutcheon for doors | [2000/46] | French: | Plaque de porte | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 22.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9202670U (SCHULTE-SCHLAGBAUM AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8512312U (HÖRMANN KG) [A] 1,4; | [A]EP0810340 (DORLA S A [ES]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2916501 (WAERTSILAE OY AB) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3310762 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2506818 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [A] 3 * the whole document * |