EP1009083 - Cable fitting for protection of a cable junction in medium voltage technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Technology, Inc. 103 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2002/04] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states RXS Gesellschaft für Vermögensverwaltung mbH Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states RXS Kabelgarnituren GmbH Profilstrasse 4 58029 Hagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guzowski, Bernd Auf dem Hövel 6 58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/47] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma P.O.Box 1137 7500 BC Enschede / NL | ||
Former [2002/32] | Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Quermann & Richardt, Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing. Corning Cable Systems GmbH & Co. KG, Patentabteilung, Kistlerhofstrasse 170 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/36] | Viering, Hans-Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Viering & Jentschura, Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124423.7 | 07.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | DE1998157334 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19857334 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1009083 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1009083 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/184, H02G15/103 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
H02G15/103 (EP,US);
H02G15/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | Kabelgarnitur zum Schutz einer Kabelverbindung in der Mittelspannungstechnik | [2000/24] | English: | Cable fitting for protection of a cable junction in medium voltage technique | [2000/24] | French: | Accessoire de câble pour la protection d'une connexion de câble dans le domaine moyenne tension | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4383131 (CLABBURN ROBIN J T) [A] 1,2 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8617005U (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME ENERGIETECHNIK) [A] 1 * page 3, line 4 - line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3521946 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0435569 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0681010 (RXS SCHRUMPFTECH GARNITUREN [DE]) [AD] 1,5* claim 1 *; | [A]DE19513618 (RXS SCHRUMPFTECH GARNITUREN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 23 - line 63; figure 1 * |