EP0989193 - DNA analyzing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kambara, Hideki 1-4-3, Kitanodai Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192 / JP | 02 /
Okano, Kazunori 5-17-2-402, Hon-cho Shiki-shi, Saitama-ken 353 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Satoshi 202, Dai-12 Shin'ei-manshon, 1-5-17, Nishi Kunitachi-shi, Tokyo 186 / JP | 04 /
Nagai, Keiichi 3-44-14-9-204, Sakuragaoka Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | 05 /
Takakaski, Kazuko C-101, Green-saido-Haitsu, 177 Chiyo Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0215 / JP | 06 /
Hirabayashi, Hiroko 1-1-24, Jyosui-minami-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-0021 / JP | [2000/34] |
Former [2000/25] | 01 /
Kambara, Hideki 1-4-3, Kitanodai Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192 / JP | ||
02 /
Okano, Kazunori 5-17-2-402, Hon-cho Shiki-shi, Saitama-ken 353 / JP | |||
03 /
Takahashi, Satoshi 202, Dai-12 Shin'ei-manshon, 1-5-17, Nishi Kunitachi-shi, Tokyo 186 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagai, Keiichi 3-44-14-9-204, Sakuragaoka Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | |||
05 /
Kawamoto, Kazuko 309, Hitachi Ozaki-haitsu, 3-8-9, Higashi-koigakub Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185 / JP | |||
06 /
Furuyama, Hiroko 110, Hitachi Ozaki-haitsu, 3-8-9, Higashi-koigakub Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185 / JP | |||
Former [2000/13] | 01 /
Kambara, Hideki 1-4-3, Kitanodai Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192 / JP | ||
02 /
Okano, Kazunori 5-17-2-402, Hon-cho Shiki-shi, Saitama-ken 353 / JP | |||
03 /
Takahashi, Satoshi 202, Dai-12 Shin'ei-manshon, 1-5-17, Nishi Kunitachi-shi, Tokyo 186 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagai, Keiichi 3-44-14, Sakuragaoka Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | |||
05 /
Kawamoto, Kazuko 309, Hitachi Ozaki-haitsu, 3-8-9, Higashi-koigakub Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185 / JP | |||
06 /
Furuyama, Hiroko 110, Hitachi Ozaki-haitsu, 3-8-9, Higashi-koigakub Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 99124555.6 | 23.06.1994 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19930155534 | 25.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15553493 | JP19930189624 | 30.07.1993 Original published format: JP 18962493 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989193 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989193 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989193 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6846 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6846, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2525/191 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2525/191, C12Q2523/107, C12Q2521/319 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/13] | Title | German: | DNS-Analyse Verfahren | [2000/13] | English: | DNA analyzing method | [2000/13] | French: | Procédé d'analyse d'ADN | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94109745.3 / EP0630972 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9210587 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]) [X] 11 * page 22, line 20 - page 23, line 31 *; | [A]EP0309969 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8910977 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]) [A] 1,6,7,9,10 * the whole document, esp. page 24 *; | [A]EP0224126 (UNIV CALGARY [CA]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9210588 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9317126 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 5, paragraph L - page 13, line 17 * * page 17, paragraph L - page 30, line 16 *; | [X] - HUNKAPILLER T ET AL, "LARGE-SCALE AND AUTOMATED DNA SEQUENCE DETERMINATION", SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, (19911004), vol. 254, no. 5028, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 59 - 67, XP000371787 [X] 11 * page 64, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 65; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1925562 | [DX] - S.P.A. FODOR ET AL., "Light-directed, spatially addressable parallel chemical synthesis", SCIENCE, (19910215), vol. 251, no. 4995, pages 767 - 773, XP000486899 [DX] 11 * the whole document, especially page 768, figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1990438 | [X] - SMITH L M, "AUTOMATED DNA SEQUENCING: A LOOK INTO THE FUTURE", CANCER DETECTION AND PREVENTION,XX,XX, (19930101), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0361-090X, pages 283 - 288, XP000602228 [X] 11 * page 286; figure 4 * | [T] - A.B. CHETVERIN ET AL., "Oligonucleotide arrays: new concepts and possibilities", BIOTECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, vol. 12, pages 1093 - 1099, XP000606269 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1194-1093 |