EP1009123 - Reed-solomon receiving ciruit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muraoka, Shinya NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124581.2 | 09.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | JP19980350547 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35054798 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1009123 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP);
H04L1/0045 (EP);
H04L1/0071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reed-Solomon-Empfangsschaltung | [2000/24] | English: | Reed-solomon receiving ciruit | [2000/24] | French: | Dispositif pour décoder le code reed-solomon | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |