EP0987899 - Adaptive variable-length coding method for video data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/12] | Adaptive variable-length coding and decoding method for video data | ||
[2004/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jo, Jae Moon 835-704, Hyundai Apt., Jangmi Maeul, Yatap-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam, Kyungki-do 463-070 / KR | 02 /
Jeon, Je Chang 108-1007, Wooseong Apt., Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul, 137-130 / KR | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Walsh, David Patrick, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Walsh, David Patrick, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99124622.4 | 16.12.1994 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | KR19280007493 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: KR 2807493 | KR19340049794 | 15.12.1994 Original published format: KR 3449794 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0987899 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0987899 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987899 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/50 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
H03M7/30 (KR);
H03M7/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/157 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Adaptives variables Längenkodierungsverfahren für Videodaten | [2004/34] | English: | Adaptive variable-length coding method for video data | [2004/33] | French: | Méthode adaptative de codage de longeur variable pour des données vidéo | [2004/33] |
Former [2000/12] | Adaptives variablen Längenkodierung- und Dekodierungsverfahren für Videodaten | ||
Former [2000/12] | Adaptive variable-length coding and decoding method for video data | ||
Former [2000/12] | Méthode adaptative de codage et décodage de longeur variable pour des données vidéo | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 23.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95903454.7 / EP0685137 | Divisional application(s) | EP04006479.2 / EP1441536 | EP04006480.0 / EP1445962 | EP04019814.5 / EP1484926 | EP04019815.2 / EP1494484 | EP04019816.0 / EP1515568 | EP04019817.8 / EP1487218 | EP07115838.0 / EP1863290 | EP07115839.8 / EP1863291 | EP07115842.2 / EP1863292 | EP08100822.9 / EP1914997 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0542474 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-14 * page 5, line 30 - page 5, line 42 * * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 18; figures 1A-1N,2,10,14 * [Y] 3,6-8; | [X]EP0536630 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-14 * page 1, line 14 - page 2, line 8 * * page 10, line 37 - page 10, line 46 * * page 34, line 29 - page 36, line 11; figures 1,15,58 *; | [YA]GB2267410 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3,6-8 * page 21, line 5 - page 23, line 16; figures 4,6-8 * [A] 1,2,4,5,9-14; | [A]EP0469835 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 20 * * figures 5A,5B,8 * |