EP1013771 - Non-nuclear chromosomal transformation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Large Scale Biology Corporation 3333 Vaca Valley Parkway Vacaville, CA 95688 / US | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Biosource Technologies, Inc. 3333 Vaca Valley Parkway Vacaville, CA 95688 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grill, Lawrence K. 736 Brentwood Place Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Erwin, Robert L. 336 Summerfield Drive Vacaville, CA 95687 / US | 03 /
Berliner, David L. 380 Selby Lane Atherton, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
Hubbard, Ernest T., Jr. 665 Rio Vista Drive Napa, CA 94558 / US | 05 /
Turpen, Thomas H. 100 Summerfield Drive, #265 Vacaville, CA 95687 / US | [2000/33] |
Former [2000/31] | 01 /
Grill, Lawrence K. 736 Brentwood Place Los altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Erwin, Robert L. 336 Summerfield Drive Vacaville, California 95687 / US | |||
03 /
Berliner, David L. 380 Selby Lane Atherton, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
Hubbard, Ernest T., Jr. 665 Rio Vista Drive Napa, CA 94558 / US | |||
05 /
Turpen, Thomas H. 100 Summerfield Drive, #265 Vacaville, CA 95687 / US | |||
Former [2000/26] | 01 /
Grill, Lawrence K. 736 Brentwood Place Los altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Erwin, Robert L. 417 Arkansas Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | |||
03 /
Berliner, David L. 380 Selby Lane Atherton, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
Hubbard, Ernest T., Jr. 665 Rio Vista Drive Napa, CA 94558 / US | |||
05 /
Turpen, Thomas H. 100 Summerfield Drive, #265 Vacaville, CA 95687 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/26] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124650.5 | 24.02.1989 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19880160771 | 26.02.1988 Original published format: US 160771 | US19880160766 | 26.02.1988 Original published format: US 160766 | US19890310881 | 17.02.1989 Original published format: US 310881 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013771 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013771 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N5/14, A01H5/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/8203 (EP);
C12N15/8258 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N9/0071 (EP);
C12N9/1074 (EP);
C12N9/6459 (EP);
C12Y114/18001 (EP);
C12Y302/01031 (EP);
C12Y304/21069 (EP);
C12N2770/32622 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | Nichtnukleare chromosomale Transformation | [2000/26] | English: | Non-nuclear chromosomal transformation | [2000/26] | French: | Transformation chromosomique non-nucléaire | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89903418.5 / EP0406267 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 01.05.2000 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | IT | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | SE | 06.01.2005 | LU | 24.02.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
LU | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
LI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0067553 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA]) [A] 1-6* page 30 - page 31 *; | [XD]EP0194809 (LUBRIZOL GENETICS INC [US]) [XD] 1-5 * page 22, line 1 - line 23 * |