EP1010837 - Metal scaffold board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Layher Verwaltungs-GmbH Ochsenbacher Strasse 56 74363 Güglingen-Eibensbach / DE | [2006/33] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Wilhelm Layher Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Ochsenbacher Strasse 56 74363 Güglingen-Eibensbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langer, Carolin Ochsenbacher Str. 55 74363 Güglingen / DE | 02 /
Layher, Georg Hausener Str. 2 74336 Brackenheim / DE | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Geitz Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kirchheimer Strasse 60 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Kirchheimer Strasse 60 70619 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Patentanwälte Kriegsstrasse 234 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Utermann, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage) 74072 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124794.1 | 14.12.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | DE19981058970 | 19.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858970 | [2000/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010837 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1010837 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/15, B21D39/03 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
B23K9/0026 (EP);
B21D39/03 (EP);
B21D39/031 (EP);
E04G1/152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | Metall-Laufplanke | [2000/25] | English: | Metal scaffold board | [2000/25] | French: | Plancher d'échafaudage métallique | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 27.07.2002 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2002/49] | 18.10.2002 | Resumption of proceedings | [2002/51] | 27.07.2002 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2002/51] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | GB | 24.01.2007 | IE | 24.01.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | DK | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | DK | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2916826 (LAYHER EBERHARD); | [DA]DE19515062 (LANGER RUTH GEB LAYHER [DE]); | [A]DE29715272U (BAUMANN VERWERTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 9 - page 7, line 17 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0815980 (BABU JEAN NOEL [FR]) | by applicant | DE2916826 | DE19515062 |