EP1014030 - Measurement table arrangement comprising a movable x/y stage for coordinate measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/26] | Movable x/y stage for coordinate measurement | ||
[2002/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems Wetzlar GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaczynski, Ulrich Arthur-Weber-Weg 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Reichert, Werner F., Dr. Leica Microsystems International Holdings GmbH, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124980.6 | 15.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1998158428 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858428 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014030 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014030 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/00, H01L21/00, G01B9/02, G01B11/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G01B9/02027 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
G01B5/0016 (EP,US);
G01B9/02021 (EP,US);
G01B9/02049 (EP,US);
G01B9/02052 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Messtischanordnung mit einem verfahrbaren X/Y-Koordinaten-Messtisch | [2002/50] | English: | Measurement table arrangement comprising a movable x/y stage for coordinate measurement | [2002/50] | French: | Arrangement de table de mesure comprenant une table déplaçable en x/y pour détermination de coordonnées | [2002/50] |
Former [2000/26] | Verfahrbarer X/Y-Koordinaten-Messtisch | ||
Former [2000/26] | Movable x/y stage for coordinate measurement | ||
Former [2000/26] | Table de mesure x/y pour détermination de coordonnées | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, SE | 22.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.06.2003 | [2004/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4583847 (BATTIG UDO [DD], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5151749 (TANIMOTO AKIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5325180 (CHAPPELOW RONALD E [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3400265 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-29 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0604380 (JOHANSSON AB C E [SE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 36; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2080954 (ZEISS JENA VEB CARL) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 25 - page 1, line 41 * * page 2, line 15 - page 2, line 110; figures 1-9 * |