EP1014029 - Detector circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl Munitionssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Fischbachstrasse 16 90552 Röthenbach / DE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Regensburger, Martin Mussinanstrasse 7 92318 Neumarkt / DE | [2002/02] |
Former [2000/26] | 01 /
Regensburger Martin Mussinanstrasse 7 92318 Neumarkt / DE | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Gerhard, et al Patentassessor Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor, et al Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124996.2 | 15.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1998159394 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859394 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014029 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014029 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014029 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F42C13/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F42C13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2001/32] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Detektorschaltung | [2000/26] | English: | Detector circuit | [2000/26] | French: | Circuit détecteur | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2634595 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 1 * page 3 - page 8; figure - *; | [YA]US3910192 (DICK JOHN O, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2; figure - * [A] 2-6; | [DA]DE2456162 (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3210207 (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3410942 (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0315855 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2456162 | EP0315855 | DE3410942 | DE3210207 |