EP0999148 - Bag having protective patches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. P.O. Box 464, 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334-0464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. P.O. Box 464, 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334-0464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brady, Sean Allen 106 W. Celestial Drive Greer, SC 29651 / US | 02 /
Reviere, Richard Dee Route 1, P.O. Box 410 Tryon, NC 28782-9633 / US | 03 /
Stockley, Henry Walker III 405 Thornhill Drive Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | [2001/03] |
Former [2000/19] | 01 /
Brady, Sean Allen 106 W. Celestial Drive Greer, SC 29651 / US | ||
02 /
Reviere, Richard Dee Route 1, P.O. Box 410 Tryon, NC 28782-9633 / US | |||
03 /
Stockley, Henry Walker III 25, Carlow Court Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99125060.6 | 28.06.1995 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | US19940268087 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: US 268087 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999148 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/00, B65D75/26, B65D75/12 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
B65D75/26 (EP,US);
B65D75/004 (EP,US);
B65D2275/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | Beutel mit Schutzauflagen | [2000/19] | English: | Bag having protective patches | [2000/19] | French: | Sac doté de pièces de protection | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95925361.8 / EP0766635 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4239111 (CONANT ROGER P [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column W *; | [Y]GB1250101 (DU PONT DE NEMOURS) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * page 2, line 89 - page 2, line 106; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4450028 (VILUTIS LEONARD J [US]) [Y] 2 * figure 4 *; | [Y]DE1198731 (GROZ & SOEHNE THEODOR) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB855317 (HENRY FRANK MASO, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4450028 | US4302565 | US4302566 | US5206075 | US5241031 | WO9303093 | WO9003414 | US5272236 | US5278272 | US4278738 | US4064296 | US4120716 | US4879430 | US3552090 | US3383746 | US3628576 | - WILD ET AL, J.POLY.SCI.POLY.PHYS.ED., (1982), vol. 20, page 441 |