|
22.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.07.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2006 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.08.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
7 |