EP0994389 - Film cartridge magazine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tianello, Dennis Francis, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | 02 /
Ianni, Alfonso, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | 03 /
Romansky, John Anthony, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | 04 /
Sherman, Gerald Frederick, Jr., Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | 05 /
Matthias, William Thomas, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | 06 /
Williams, Ralph Edward, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing, et al Kodak GmbH, Patent Department (4494) 70324 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/16] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99126104.1 | 20.12.1994 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | US19930172013 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: US 172013 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994389 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0994389 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994389 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00, G03B17/30 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G03D13/005 (EP,KR,US);
G03B17/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/16] | Title | German: | Filmkassettenmagazin | [2000/16] | English: | Film cartridge magazine | [2000/16] | French: | Magasin pour cassettes de film | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94120160.0 / EP0660181 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4793761 (STERN HELMAN I [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]US4817023 (YAMAGUCHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [DA]US5231439 (TAKAHASHI KOICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract * |