EP1022688 - Postage printing system having a digital coupon distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarter, One Elmcroft Road Stamford, Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heiden, Richard W. 4 Deborah Drive Huntington, CT 06484 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99126148.8 | 29.12.1999 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19980224238 | 30.12.1998 Original published format: US 224238 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022688 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022688 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022688 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
G07B17/00733 (EP,US);
G07B17/00435 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00161 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00201 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00451 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00604 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00967 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Frankiersystem mit einem Verteilsystem von digitalen Gutscheinen | [2000/30] | English: | Postage printing system having a digital coupon distribution system | [2000/30] | French: | Système d'affranchissement avec un système de distribution de coupons digitale | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5819241 (REITER JOSHUA J [US]) [A] 1-21 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0878778 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0604148 (NEOPOST LTD [GB]) [A] 1-21 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5819240 (KARA SALIM G [US]) [A] 1-21 * figure 8; claim 1 *; | [A]US4959795 (CHRISTENSEN DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (USPS), INFORMATION BASED INDICIA PROGRAM (IBIP) INDICIUM SPECIFICATION, (19960613), XP002137735 [A] 1-21 * Appendix A * | by applicant | US4725718 | US5454038 | US5168804 | US5024153 | US4831554 | US5509109 |