EP0934864 - A Vehicle comprising a steerable rear axle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veenhuis Voertuigtechniek B.V. Tjalkstraat 9 8102 HG Raalte / NL | [2000/33] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Veenhuis Voertuigtechnik B.V. Tjalkstraat 9 8102 HG Raalte / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veenhuis, Theodorus Johannes Maria Tjalkstraat 9 8102 HG Raalte / NL | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99200331.9 | 05.02.1999 | [1999/32] | Priority number, date | NL19981008223 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: NL 1008223 | [1999/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934864 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/14 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
B60G9/00 (EP);
B62D7/144 (EP);
B60G2200/315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit lenkbarer Hinterachse | [1999/32] | English: | A Vehicle comprising a steerable rear axle | [1999/32] | French: | Véhicule à essieu arrière dirigeable | [1999/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 12.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, MC | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/49] | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0647554 (FRANCKE RENATE [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * column 13, line 38 - column 15, line 30; figures 3,4 * * column 16, line 31 - column 17, line 43; figure 5 * * column 18, line 49 - column 19, line 23; figure 8 * [Y] 3,6; | [YA]DE29608229U (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 3,6 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 14; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,5,8 |