EP0937667 - Method and apparatus to uniformly distribute bulk conveyed parts for inspection by a camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokajty, Joseph E. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Palone, Thomas W. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patents, W92-3A Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99200356.6 | 08.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | US19980026078 | 19.02.1998 Original published format: US 26078 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0937667 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0937667 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/14 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
B65G47/1492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/01] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum gleichmässigen Verteilen von gefördeten Schüttgutteilen zwecks Prüfung mittels einer Kamera | [1999/34] | English: | Method and apparatus to uniformly distribute bulk conveyed parts for inspection by a camera | [1999/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la répartition uniforme de pièces transportées en vrac pour l'inspection à l'aide d'une caméra | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/44] | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5314055 (GORDON STEVEN J [US]) [X] 10 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 43 * * abstract * [A] 1-9; | [XA]US5558199 (ROETHER FRIEDEMANN [DE], et al) [X] 10 * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [YA]US4457840 (NAGL MARTIN [AT]) [Y] 1,5,8 * column 2, line 17 - line 25 * * column 2, line 51 - line 59; figure 1 * [A] 2-4,6,7,9,10; | [YA]US3995733 (MEAD DENNIS E) [Y] 5,8 * column 2, line 12 - line 15 * * column 2, line 35 - line 46 * * column 2, line 59 - line 63 * * column 4, line 6 - line 8; figures 2,5,6 * [A] 6,7; | [Y]US4537300 (FACCHINI LIBERO [IT]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4819784 (STICHT WALTER [AT]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 50 - line 65 * * column 10, line 11 - line 35; figures 1,7 *; | [A]US5647472 (FIERKENS RICHARD H J [NL]) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |