EP0939237 - Fast locking anti-rotation device in a remote control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondial Trade Agency Limited Europe Centre, 113 St. Francis Street Floriana Vlt. 15 / MT | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alkan, Yenal Moda CAD No. 223/23 Kadikoy, Istanbul / TR | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99200412.7 | 12.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI00369 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: IT MI980369 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939237 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0939237 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/26 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
F16C1/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/20] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnell verriegelnde Antirotationsvorrichtung für Fernsteuerung | [1999/35] | English: | Fast locking anti-rotation device in a remote control apparatus | [1999/35] | French: | Dispositif antirotation à verrouillage rapide pour appareil de télécommande | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 01.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0881402 (BRAMBILLA CORNELIA [IT]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2147673 (KIENZLE APPARATE GMBH) | by applicant | EP0285299 |