EP0963852 - A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desie, Guido c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IEE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Van den Wijngaert, Hilbrand c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IEE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Backeljauw, François c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IEE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [1999/50] | Application number, filing date | 99200479.6 | 18.02.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | EP19980201965 | 09.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98201965 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963852 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963852 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/415 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
B41J2/4155 (EP);
G03G2217/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckverfahren und Steuerung für Druckkopf mit Ablenkelektroden zum direkten elektrostatischen Drucken | [1999/50] | English: | A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes. | [1999/50] | French: | Méthode d'impression et contrôle pour une tête d'impression avec électrodes de déviation pour l'impression électrostatique directe | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 23.12.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.05.2001 | NL | 16.05.2001 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/12] | BE | 16.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19739988 (ARRAY PRINTERS AB [SE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9735725 (ARRAY PRINTERS AB [SE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0945275 | by applicant | US3689935 | US4860036 | US5666148 | US5714992 | US5659344 | EP0780740 | US5625392 | DE19534705 |