EP0947833 - Optical translation measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTM Technologies Ltd. 85 Medinat Hayehudim Street, Herzelia Business Park Herzelia 46766 / IL | [2002/03] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states GOU Lite Ltd. 85 Medinat Hayehudim Street, Herzelia Business Park Herzelia 46766 / IL | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states GOU Lite Ltd. 85 Medinat Hayehudim Street Herzelia Business Park Herzelia 46766 / IL | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states OTM Technologies, Ltd. 11 Bouboulinas Street Nicosia / CY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lederer, Gilad 7 Alumim Street 69690 Tel-Aviv / IL | 02 /
Kinrot, Uri 25 Hadror Street 45268 Hod-Hasharon / IL | 03 /
Kinrot, Opher 22 Herzel Street 43354 Raanana / IL | [2001/36] |
Former [1999/40] | 01 /
Kinrot, Uri 25 Hadror Street 45268 Hod-Hasharon / IL | ||
02 /
Kinrot, Opher 22 Herzel Street 43354 Raanana / IL | |||
03 /
Lederer, Gilad 7 Alumim Street 69690 Tel-Aviv / IL | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99200687.4 | 09.03.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | WO1998IL00113 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: PCT/IL98/00113 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947833 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947833 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/36, G01D5/34, G06K11/08 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/0317 (EP,US);
G01B9/02045 (EP,US);
G01B9/02051 (EP,US);
G01B9/02057 (EP,US);
G01B9/0207 (EP,US);
G01D5/26 (EP,US);
G01P3/366 (EP,US);
G01P3/806 (EP,US);
G01S17/50 (EP,US);
G01S7/4811 (EP,US);
G06F3/0312 (EP,US);
G06F3/03543 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
G06F3/03548 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP,US);
G06F3/0421 (EP,US);
G01B2290/30 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0338 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Translationsmessung | [1999/40] | English: | Optical translation measurement | [1999/40] | French: | Mesure optique de translation | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 19.01.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 07.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.11.2001 | NL | 14.11.2001 | SE | 14.02.2002 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/33] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3888589 (SWIFT DAVID WILLIAM) [Y] 3-5 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 31; figure 5 *; | [A]DE2636211 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8807208 (PFAFF IND MASCH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [XY]US5159406 (ADLER ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12-14,17 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 50 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 65; figure 7 * [Y] 2; | [X]US5274361 (SNOW FRANK J [US]) [X] 4,5,12-14,22,23,25,27 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 13; figures 2-4 *; | [XAY]EP0614086 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 11-14,17,18,21-23 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 47; figures 2A-6 * [A] 1,4 [Y] 2-5; | [DA] - SUHURA T ET AL, "MONOLITHIC INTEGRATED-OPTIC POSITION/DISPLACEMENT SENSOR USING WAVEGUIDE GRATINGS AND QW-DFB LASER", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, new york us, (19951001), vol. 7, no. 10, pages 1195 - 1197, XP000537235 [DA] 1,2 * page 1195, column R, paragraph 1 - page 1116, column L, paragraph 1; figures 1,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.466588 | Examination | US3419330 |