EP0968723 - Healing of wounds or fibrotic disorders using at least one agent against a growth factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renovo Limited Manchester Incubator Building 48 Grafton Street Manchester M13 9XX / GB | [2009/27] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Renovo Limited Manchester Incubator Building 48 Grafton Street Manchester M13 9XX / GB | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states THE VICTORIA UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER Oxford Road Manchester M13 9PT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferguson, Mark William James Bank End Barn, Buxton Road, Furness Vale High Peak, Derbyshire SK23 7PX / GB | 02 /
Mamta, Shah 12 Lathom Road Withington Road, Manchester M20 9NX / GB | [2009/27] |
Former [2000/01] | 01 /
Ferguson, Mark William James Bank and Barn, Buxton Road, Furness Vale High Peak, Derbyshire SK23 7PX / GB | ||
02 /
Mamta, Shah 12 Lathom Road Withington Road, Manchester M20 9NX / GB | Representative(s) | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2000/01] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99201184.1 | 29.03.1995 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | GB19940006154 | 29.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9406154 | GB19940024898 | 09.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9424898 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968723 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968723 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/395, A61K38/1825 (US,EP);
A61K39/395, A61K38/1841 (EP,US);
A61K39/395, A61K38/20 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/01] | A61K39/395, // (A61K39/395, 38:18),(A61K39/395, 38:19) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | Heilung von Wunden oder fibrotischen Krankheiten unter Verwendung von wenigstens einem Agens gegen einen Wachstumsfaktor | [2009/27] | English: | Healing of wounds or fibrotic disorders using at least one agent against a growth factor | [2000/01] | French: | Guérison de plaies ou d'affections fibrotiques utilisant au moins un agent contre un facteur de croissance | [2000/01] |
Former [2000/01] | Heilung von Wunden oder fibrotischen Krankheiten unter Verwendung von wenigstens einem Agens gegen einen Wachstumsfaktor | Examination procedure | 01.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95913237.4 / EP0754058 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | LU | 29.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5094941 (HART CHARLES E [US]) [X] 1,8,12-15 * claim - *; | [DX]WO9217206 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB]) [DX] 1-9,12-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9310808 (JOLLA CANCER RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1,8,9,12-15 * page 9, line 20 - line 37 * * claims 1,4 *; | [DX]WO9319769 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [DX] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9319783 (WHITTIER INST DIABETES & ENDOC [US]) [X] 1,8,9,12-15 * example VIII * * claim - *; | [X] - M. SHAH ET AL., "Control of scarring in adult wounds by neutralizing antibody to transforming growth factor beta.", THE LANCET, London, GB, (19920125), vol. 339, no. 8787, pages 213 - 214, XP002120537 [X] 1,8,9,12-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-6736(92)90009-R | [PX] - M. SHAH ET AL., "Neutralising antibody to TGF-beta1,2 reduces cutaneous scarring in adult rodents.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, London, GB, (199405), vol. 107, no. 5, pages 1137 - 1157, XP000609040 [PX] 1-9,12-15 * abstract * | [PX] - M. SHAH ET AL., "Neutralisation of TGF-beta1 and TGF-beta2 or exogenous addition of TGF-beta3 to cutaneous rat wounds reduces scarring.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, London, GB, (199503), vol. 108, no. 3, pages 985 - 1002, XP002025316 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * | [PX] - N. ADZICK ET AL., "Cells, matrix, growth factors, and the surgeon.", ANNALS OF SURGERY, St. Louis, MO, USA, (199407), vol. 220, no. 1, pages 10 - 18, XP002120538 [PX] 1-9,12-15 * abstract * * table 2 * |