EP0961069 - Pipe clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. van Walraven B.V. Industrieweg 5 3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states J. van Walraven B.V. Industrieweg 5 NL-3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Walraven, Jan 6, Prins Bernhardlaan 3641 GP Mijdrecht / NL | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 99201639.4 | 25.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | NL19981009276 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: NL 1009276 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961069 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/10, F16L55/033 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
F16L3/12 (EP);
F16L3/1016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rohrschelle | [1999/48] | English: | Pipe clamp | [1999/48] | French: | Collier de serrage pour tuyaux | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/09] | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.07.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19726331 (SINN EDGAR [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4431692 (KRATZER F MEFA DUEBEL GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0713039 (FLAMCO BV [NL]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]DE9216499U (BTI BEFESTIGUNGSTECH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * figures 1-5B * | by applicant | EP0387967 | EP0512654 | DE4431692 | EP0671579 |