EP0961193 - Secure computing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [2010/35] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laczko Sr., Frank L. 301 S. Jupiter, P.O. Box 23 Allen, Collin County, Texas / US | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited, P.O. Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99201705.3 | 28.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | US19980087229 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87229 | US19980087195 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87195 | US19980087262 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87262 | US19980087230P | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87230 P | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961193 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961193 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961193 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
G06F11/362 (EP);
G06F12/1027 (EP);
G06F12/145 (EP);
H04N21/42684 (EP);
H04N21/42692 (EP);
H04N21/443 (EP);
H04N21/4432 (EP);
H04N21/4627 (EP);
H04N7/16 (EP);
H04N7/163 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | G06F1/00, G06F12/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/18] |
Former [2007/05] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sichere Rechnervorrichtung | [1999/48] | English: | Secure computing device | [1999/48] | French: | Dispositif ordinateur sécurisé | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5643086 (ALCORN ALLAN E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 19 * * column 6, line 1 - line 25 * * column 7, line 9 - column 9, line 25 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [X]EP0816970 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 29 *; | [X]US5224160 (PAULINI WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 27 *; | [Y]US5421006 (JABLON DAVID P [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 19, line 1 - line 55 *; | [A]US4453230 (MIZOGUCHI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 31; figure 2 *; | [X]US4278837 (BEST ROBERT M) [X] 10,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 59 * * column 7, line 4 - line 8 * * column 7, line 43 - line 50 * * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 2 * * figure 3 *; | [X]WO9809209 (INTERTRUST TECH CORP [US]) [X] 10,11 * page 184, line 20 - page 186, line 14 * * page 213, line 16 - line 22 * * page 498, line 10 - page 504, line 21 *; | [X]US5666411 (MCCARTY JOHNNIE C [US]) [X] 10,11 * abstract * * column 7, line 30 - line 34 * * column 11, line 51 - line 56 * * column 18, line 12 - line 33 * * column 21, line 29 - line 31 * * column 23, line 30 - line 33 *; | [XY]JPH09198316 ; | US5826007 [ ] (SAKAKI KINYA [JP], et al) [ ] * column 5, line 15 - line 30 * * column 6, line 3 - line 13 *; | [X]US5740413 (ALPERT DONALD [US], et al) [X] 12 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 27 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09198316 A 19970731 (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA INF SYST JAPAN CORP) [X] 12 * abstract * [Y] 14 | by applicant | US6065113 |