EP0964293 - Method and apparatus for loading film using a rotating hook [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garlock, Mark D. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Watkins, Joseph A. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/26] |
Former [1999/50] | 01 /
Garlock, Mark D. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | ||
02 /
Watkins, joseph A. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/16] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/50] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99201744.2 | 01.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | US19980094965 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: US 94965 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964293 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964293 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964293 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/30, G03B19/04 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
G03B19/04 (EP,US);
G03B17/30 (EP,US);
G03B2217/266 (EP,US);
G03B2217/268 (EP,US);
G03B2219/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/01] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Laden eines Films unter Verwendung eines rotierenden Hakens | [1999/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for loading film using a rotating hook | [1999/50] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de chargement de film utilisant un crochet pivotant | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 13.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.10.2004 | DE | 28.01.2005 | GB | 01.06.2005 | [2006/35] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 27.10.2004 | |
DE | 28.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | DE | 28.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4440483 (LINKE GERDA [DE], et al) [DA] 1,7 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US2484248 (ROEHRL BRUNO C) [DA] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US3288389 (JOSEF GERSCH, et al) [DA] 1 * column 2 - column 5; figures 1-4 * |