EP1066836 - Filler/binder hollow particles for tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensus, part of Coöperatie COSUN U.A. Oostenlijke Havendijk 15 4704 RA Roosendaal / NL | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2001/02] | Application number, filing date | 99201865.5 | 11.06.1999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066836 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/36 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Füllstoff/Bindemittel Hohlpartikeln für Tabletten | [2001/02] | English: | Filler/binder hollow particles for tablets | [2001/02] | French: | Particules creuses d'un agent de charge/liant pour comprimés | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2001/27] | 13.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0376331 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * claims 1-3 ** page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 2 * |