EP0989301 - Ignition timing control system for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, 1-chome Hirosawacho, Kiryu-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2006/19] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, 1-chome Hirosawacho Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaba, Mitsunori 1618-12 Omatacho Ashikaga-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Nozue, Yutaka 148-12 Oaza-Kugu, Kasakakemachi Nitta-Gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/42] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2000/13] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203053.6 | 20.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980267873 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26787398 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989301 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989301 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989301 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02P5/15 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/445 (EP);
F02D41/2425 (EP);
F02D41/26 (EP);
F02P5/1514 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2003/14] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zündzeitpunktsteuersystem für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2000/13] | English: | Ignition timing control system for an internal combustion engine | [2000/13] | French: | Système de commande de synchronisation d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4730256 (NIIMI YUKIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 32 * * column 2, line 55 - line 60 * * column 3, line 14 - line 37 * * column 4, line 10 - line 19 * * column 5, line 22 - line 25 * * figures 1,6 *; | [X]US5247446 (MOTZ ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * column A * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 46 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,8-10,12,15-17 *; | [A]US4896263 (BRAUNINGER JURGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8 * column 3, line 18 - line 57 * * column 5, line 1 - line 61 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9209957 (WEBER U S A INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 12 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 4 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 14 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5787381 (SASAKI SHOJI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column W *; | [A]US5497330 (ISHIDA YASUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 4 - line 23 * * figure 2 * |