EP0967524 - Projection exposure method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraishi, Naomasa 11-6-F204, Shinsaku 5-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/52] | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203179.9 | 15.11.1991 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19900309458 | 15.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30945890 | JP19900309459 | 15.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30945990 | JP19900408093 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40809390 | JP19900408094 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40809490 | JP19900408095 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40809590 | JP19900408096 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40809690 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967524 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967524 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G02B27/00 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G03F9/7088 (EP);
G03F7/201 (EP);
G03F7/70066 (EP);
G03F7/70108 (EP);
G03F7/70141 (EP);
G03F7/70158 (EP);
G03F7/70208 (EP);
G03F7/70316 (EP);
G03F7/70333 (EP);
G03F7/70358 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Projektionsbelichtung | [1999/52] | English: | Projection exposure method and apparatus | [1999/52] | French: | Méthode et appareil de projection pour exposition | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 18.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91310550.8 / EP0486316 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 15   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0352975 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH) [DA] 1,20,33-46 * page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 33 * * figure - *; | [A]US3776633 (FROSCH A ET AL) [A] 39-42,44 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 3,4; claims 1,3 *; | [A] - "EXTENDED FOCAL DEPTH OPTICAL MICROLITHOGRAPHY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19890601), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 125 - 127, XP000033309 [A] 43 * the whole document * |