EP0994461 - Method for automatically recognising a spelled speech utterance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wuppermann, Friedhelm Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Stahl, Volker Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Gössmann, Klemens Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2000/16] | Application number, filing date | 99203303.5 | 07.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | DE1998147419 | 14.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847419 | [2000/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994461 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,US);
G10L2015/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Erkennung einer buchstabierten sprachlichen Äusserung | [2000/16] | English: | Method for automatically recognising a spelled speech utterance | [2000/16] | French: | Procédé de reconnaissance automatique d'une expression vocale épellée | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |