EP0971274 - Multi-functional timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takizawa, Katsuyoshi, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Shibuya, Norio, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Takashi, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203375.3 | 19.12.1997 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960348687 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34868796 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971274 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971274 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971274 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/24, G04B19/08, G04B19/25 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
G04B19/25 (EP,US);
G04B19/085 (EP,US);
G04B19/235 (EP,US);
G04B19/241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/48] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrzweckuhr | [2000/02] | English: | Multi-functional timepiece | [2000/02] | French: | Montre multi-fonctionnelle | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97310324.5 / EP0851321 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.05.2004 | [2008/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR369193 (GUSTAVE ADRIEN QUARTIER [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3696609 (DUBOIS GERALD) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XA]US3882669 (JAKOB EDWIN) [X] 6 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0558756 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * column 14, line 48 - line 53 * * column 17, line 37 - column 18, line 4 * * column 21, line 3 - line 29 * * figures 5,10,13 * |