EP1094110 - Apoptosis inducing proteinaceous substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leadd B.V. Wassenaarseweg 72 2333 AL Leiden / NL | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noteborn, Mathieu Hubertus Maria Sternstraat 15 2352 EH Leiderdorp / NL | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2001/17] | Application number, filing date | 99203467.8 | 21.10.1999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094110 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/34, C07K14/01, C07K16/08, A61K39/12 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2002/03] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Proteinsubstanz das Apoptose induziert | [2001/17] | English: | Apoptosis inducing proteinaceous substance | [2001/17] | French: | Substance protéinique induisant l'apoptose | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.12.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NISHIZAWA T. ET AL., "Non-B, non-C, non-G hepatitis virus gene DNA sequence.", GENESEQ DATABASE ; ACCESSION NUMBER X18959, (19990513), XP002136316 [X] 9,10,12 * the whole document * | [X] - OKAMOTO HIROAKI ET AL, "The entire nucleotide sequence of a TT virus isolate from the United States (TUS01): Comparison with reported isolates and phylogenetic analysis.", VIROLOGY JULY 5, 1999, (19990705), vol. 259, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 437 - 448, XP002136317 [X] 9,10,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1999.9769 | [X] - OKAMOTO H. ET AL., "TT virus genotype 1a DNA, complete genome.", EMBL DATABASE ; ACCESSION NUMBER AB017610, (19990814), XP002136318 [X] 9,10,12 * the whole document * | [X] - OKAMOTO H. ET AL, "Molecular cloning and characterization of a novel DNA virus (TTV) associated with posttransfusion hepatitis of unknown etiology", HEPATOLOGY RESEARCH_(_HEPATOL. RES._), 10/1 (1-16), Ireland, XP000892167 [X] 9,10,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-6346(97)00123-X | [X] - OKAMOTO H. ET AL., "TT virus genes for ORF2 and ORF1, complete cds.", EMBL DATABSE; ACCESSION NUMBER AB008394, (19980313), XP002136319 [X] 9,10,12 * the whole document * | [A] - ROULSTON A. ET AL, "Viruses and apoptosis", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY_(_ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL._), 1999, 53/- (577-628), United States, XP000892185 [A] 1,9,10,12 * abstract * * page 590, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.micro.53.1.577 |