EP1022112 - High temperature wet filament winding arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electric Boat Corporation 75 Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340-4989 / US | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Mitchell D. 54B Knob Hill Road New London, Connecticut 06320 / US | 02 /
Van Dine, Pieter 40 Overlook Avenue Mystic, Connecticut 06355 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203625.1 | 03.11.1999 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19990234573 | 21.01.1999 Original published format: US 234573 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022112 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022112 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022112 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/66 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B29C53/845 (EP,US);
B29C53/8016 (EP,US);
B29C53/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/44] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Hochtemperaturnasswickeln von Fäden | [2000/30] | English: | High temperature wet filament winding arrangement | [2000/30] | French: | Dispositif pour l'enroulement de filaments enduits à haute température | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 15.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 18.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02220828 ; | [A]US3627601 (HAYES CHARLES M, et al) [A] 3* figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0463611 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1 * page 3, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [X]SE508393 (APPLIED COMPOSITES AB ACAB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2; | WO9912716 [ ] (APPLIED COMPOSITES AKTIEBOLAG [SE], et al) [ ] * page 4, line 34 - line 36; figure 1; claims 11-13,15,17-19 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901116), vol. 014, no. 523, Database accession no. (M - 1049), & JP02220828 A 19900904 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * |