EP1002642 - Laminator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texmach B.V. Mercuriusweg 17 6971 GV Brummen / NL | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
d'Hondt, Arnold August Petronella Marie De Laurier 5 5831 RP Boxmeer / NL | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/47] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma P.O.Box 18558 2502 EN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2004/46] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, P.O. Box 18558 2502 EN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/21] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99203855.4 | 18.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | NL19981010620 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: NL 1010620 | [2000/21] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002642 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002642 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B31/12, B32B31/08, B32B5/18, B32B7/12 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
B29C65/26 (EP,US);
B29C65/1432 (EP,US);
B29C66/0242 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/83413 (EP,US);
B32B37/06 (EP,US);
B32B37/1207 (EP,US);
B29C65/1412 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/0042 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/83431 (EP,US);
B32B2305/022 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2827/18 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2883/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | Kaschiermaschine | [2000/21] | English: | Laminator | [2000/21] | French: | Dispositif de laminage | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | CY | 18.11.2005 | IE | 18.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/49] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 18.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1417500 (SOLVAY) [X] 1,8 * figure 3; example 3; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1073566 (ALCIDE MORA) [A] 1 * figures 2,4; claims 10,11 *; | [XY]NL7015947 (SOCIÉTÉ EN NOM COLLECTIF DITE: ISÈRE-NORD) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 17; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5; | [A]GB1342962 (KANNEGIESSIER MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 4,5 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]US3823047 (COLOMBO R) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]AT349203B (KOEPP AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2218040 (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 3-5 *; | [Y]DE4240285 (SITO METALL UND KUNSTSTOFFVERA [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * column 4, line 15 - line 27; figure 1; claims 1,4 *; | [X]DE4208812 (TUBUS BAUER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 4, line 45 - line 56; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5527422 (SCHNYDER EUGEN [CH], et al) [A] 4,5* figure 1; claim 1 * |