EP1024417 - Electronic equipment control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Harumi c/o Sony Corporation, 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203987.5 | 26.07.1996 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | JP19950212633 | 28.07.1995 Original published format: JP 21263395 | JP19950219776 | 04.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21977695 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024417 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024417 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G11B15/087, H04N5/765 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
G06F15/163 (KR);
G11B15/026 (EP,US);
G11B15/087 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/31] | Title | German: | Steuerung einer elektronischen Anlage | [2000/31] | English: | Electronic equipment control | [2000/31] | French: | Commande d'un équipement électronique | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96305483.8 / EP0756276 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4918690 (MARKKULA JR ARMAS C [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * column 3, line 21 - column 15, line 43; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2-4,8; | [Y]EP0640924 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-4,8 * column 6, line 9 - column 8, line 8; figures 3,6; claim 1 *; | [A]US4866769 (KARP ALAN H [US]) [A] 1-8 * column A *; | [A]EP0580367 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 48 - column 8, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [PA]EP0689296 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,5,8,14 *; | [X] - MUELLER R, LON - DAS UNIVERSELLE NETZWERK TEIL 1. ÖEIN NEUARTIGES KONZEPT, UM STEUERGERAETE, SENSOREN UND AKTOREN MITEINANDER SPRECHEN ZU LASSEN, ELEKTRONIK,DE,FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, VOL. 40, NR. 22, PAGE(S) 59-62,64-65,, ISSN 0013-5658, XP000268228 [X] 1,5,7 * page 61 - page 64 * | [A] - PINTO J J, TRULY DISTRIBUTED CONTROL SYSTEMS THROUGH INTELLIGENT, NETWORKED I/O, ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL,US,INSTRUMENT SOCIETY OF AMERICA, RESEARCH TRIANGLE PARK, VOL. 48, NR. PART 02, PAGE(S) 969-976, ISSN 1054-0032, XP000435400 [A] 1-8 * page 971 - page 974; figure 2 * | [A] - HOFFMAN G ET AL, "IEEE 1394: A UBIQUITOUS BUS", COMPCON, TECHNOLOGIES FOR THE INFORMATION SUPERHIGHWAY SAN FRANCISCO, IEEE, (19950305), no. CONF. 40, pages 334 - 338, XP000545446 [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * |