EP1030394 - Power generation system using a solid oxide fuel cell and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Botti, Jean Joseph 3387 Sussex Rocherster Hills, Michigan 48306 / US | 02 /
Grieve, Malcolm James 21 Wenlock Road Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 03 /
Miller, Carl Elmer 8788 State Road Millington, Michigan 48746 / US | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | BorgWarner France SAS Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Delphi France SAS Patent Department 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/11] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99204410.7 | 20.12.1999 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | US19990241171 | 01.02.1999 Original published format: US 241171 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1030394 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1030394 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030394 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02B1/12, B60L11/18, F01K25/00, F02C6/00, H01M8/06, H01M8/04 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H01M8/04 (EP,US);
B60L50/70 (EP,US);
F01K25/00 (EP,US);
F02B1/12 (EP,US);
F02C6/00 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (EP,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
Y02T90/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | H01M8/04, H01M8/06, B60L11/18, F01K25/00, F02C6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/08] |
Former [2005/21] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Energiegewinnungssystem unter Verwendung einer Festoxidbrennstoffzelle und Verfahren | [2000/34] | English: | Power generation system using a solid oxide fuel cell and method | [2000/34] | French: | Système de production d'énergie utilisant une pile à combustible à oxyde solide et procédé | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2016 | 03.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.02.2017 | [2017/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5501781 (HSU MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * pages 3-6 * * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 64 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 38 - line 49 * * column 5, line 19 - line 30 * * column 8, line 22 - line 39 * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 42 * * column 10, line 27 - line 40 * * claims 8-12,26 * [A] 3,4,8,12,15,27,29; | [XA]US5413879 (DOMERACKI WILLIAM F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [A] 3-8,10-19,25-28; | [A]US5409784 (BROMBERG LESLIE [US], et al) [A] 1-3,10,12,15,29 * figures 6,14,16 * * claims 1,6,11,18 * * column 1, line 6 - line 64 * * column 2, line 19 - line 37 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 4 * * column 7, line 22 - line 43 * * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 12 *; | [A]US5532573 (BROWN DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12,15 * figures 1,4-6 * * column 2, line 3 - line 27 * * column 3, line 7 - line 8 * * column 3, line 37 - line 46 * * column 4, line 32 - line 39 * * column 5, line 9 - line 23 * * column 6, line 57 - line 62 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 42 * * column 10, line 9 - line 36 *; | [A]US5837393 (OKAMOTO TAKAFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-3,7-14,16,17,19,22-24,29 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 64 *; | [A]US4031865 (DUFOUR PATRICK) [A] 1,2,12,20,21 * the whole document * | Examination | DE19622073 | US2011159386 | EP1420472 | by applicant | US5501781 | US5413879 | US5409784 | US5532573 | US5837393 | US4031865 |