EP1021044 - Method and apparatus for encoding or decoding audio or video frame data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voessing, Walter Remarqueweg 23 30455 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Schreiber, Ulrich Raiffeisenstrasse 7 30827 Garbsen / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250006.6 | 12.01.1999 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021044 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/52 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
H04N19/152 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/13] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsverfahren und Kodierungsvorrichtung für Audio- oder Videorahmendaten | [2000/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for encoding or decoding audio or video frame data | [2000/29] | French: | Méthode de traitement et appareil de codage pour trames de données audio et vidéo | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/03] | 27.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4845752 (BLANC ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE4222150 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]WO9715983 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 8, line 7 - line 17 *; | [A]US5706396 (SCHROEDER ERNST F [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A] - KIM S -Y ET AL, "A REAL-TIME IMPLEMENTATION OF THE MPEG-2 AUDIO ENCODER", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19970801), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 593 - 597, XP000742536 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.628681 | [A] - BOLAND S ET AL, "NEW RESULTS IN LOW BITRATE AUDIO CODING USING A COMBINED HARMONIC -WAVELET REPRESENTATION", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, PLENARY, EXPERT SUMMARIES, SPECIAL, AUDIO, UNDERWATER ACOUSTICS, VL MUNICH, APR. 21 - 24, 1997, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19970421), vol. 1, pages 351 - 354, XP000789186 [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * |