EP0936189 - Device for biological water treatment with rotating contact bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauptmann, Helmuth Rostocker Strasse 35 17033 Neubrandenburg / DE | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauptmann, Helmuth Rostocker Strasse 35 17033 Neubrandenburg / DE | 02 /
Hauptmann, Jens Rostocker Strasse 35 17033 Neubrandenburg / DE | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250041.3 | 10.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | DE1998106356 | 10.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19806356 | [1999/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936189 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936189 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/08 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
C02F3/082 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GR, IT, PT [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anlage zur biologischen Abwasserbehandlung mit rotierenden Kontaktkörpern | [1999/33] | English: | Device for biological water treatment with rotating contact bodies | [1999/33] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement biologique des eaux usées avec des lits tournants | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.11.2001 | [2005/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2133351 (SADOULET MAURICE) [A] 1,11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2097817 (PRENDERGAST ANGELA, et al) [A] 1,3,6,7 * page 2, lines 118-126; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4522714 (THISSEN CHRISTOPHER P [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * |