EP0945269 - Inking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furukawa, Shigeo, c/o Komori Corporation Sekiyado Plant, 210 Sekiyadomachi, Kirigasaku Higashikatsushika-gun, Chiba / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250089.2 | 22.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980073741 | 23.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7374198 | JP19990067877 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6787799 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945269 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945269 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/04, B41F31/18 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
B41F31/04 (EP,US);
B41F31/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbwerk | [1999/39] | English: | Inking device | [1999/39] | French: | Dispositif d'encrage | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0236105 (HORN LTD JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,6,10,11 * column 4, line 5 - line 49; figure 3 * |