EP0957566 - Asynchronous motor with controllable speed and direction of rotation for drive units, in particular for hoisting units or running gears [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Handelsriege 14 58339 Breckerfeld / DE | 02 /
Müller, Anton Deipenbeckerweg 36 58300 Wetter / DE | 03 /
Persico, Giuliano, Dipl.-Ing. Am Brasberg 31 58300 Wetter / DE | 04 /
Krebs, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Paracelsusstrasse 16 58300 Wetter / DE | 05 /
Grieb, Eckerhardt, Dipl.-Ing. Im Gärtchen 26 58093 Hagen / DE | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Moser, Jörg Michael, et al Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Moser, Jörg Michael, et al Rosastrasse 6 A 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250136.1 | 26.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | DE1998123379 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823379 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0957566 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0957566 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, H02K7/102 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H02K7/1025 (EP,US);
H02K17/30 (KR);
H02K11/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/01] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drehzahl- und drehrichtungssteuerbarer Asynchronmotor für Fahrantriebe, insbesondere für Hub- und Fahrwerke | [1999/46] | English: | Asynchronous motor with controllable speed and direction of rotation for drive units, in particular for hoisting units or running gears | [1999/46] | French: | Moteur asynchrone à vitesse et sens de rotation réglable pour dispositifs d'entraînement, en particulier pour mécanismes de levage ou trains de roulement | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0610767 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 55 *; | [Y]DD244206 (BARKAS WERKE VEB [DD]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * page 2, line 34 - line 54 *; | [Y]DE3420807 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * page 4, line 13 - line 19 *; | [A]DE3820903 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 57 *; | [A]FR2691854 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * page 9, line 9 - line 20 * |