EP0981125 - Electronic train direction display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funkwerk Information Technologies Karlsfeld GmbH Liebigstrasse 1a 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [2008/29] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Vossloh Information Technologies Karlsfeld GmbH Dieselstrasse 8 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Rail Systems GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berg, Bärbel Heilbronner Strasse 18 10779 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Zach, René Felgentreustrasse 50 12249 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Dolata, Thomas Wischbergeweg 28 13089 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Risch, René Gorgasring 29 13533 Berlin / DE | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte, Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 münchen / DE | ||
Former [2001/43] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Gmeiner, Christa, c/o DaimlerChrysler AG, et al Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstrasse 10/Geb. 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2000/08] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin, et al Hardtstrasse 9 70499 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250199.9 | 19.06.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | DE19982015264U | 19.08.1998 Original published format: DE 29815264 U | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981125 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981125 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/35 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
B61D49/00 (EP);
G09F7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/44] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronische Zuglaufanzeige | [2000/08] | English: | Electronic train direction display | [2000/08] | French: | Dispositif pour l'affichage de la direction d'un train | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.2006
09.02.2007
WITHDRAWN Deutsche Bahn Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE Opponent's representative Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG HLM 4 - Patentabteilung Richelstrasse 3 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.2006
09.02.2007
WITHDRAWN Deutsche Bahn Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE Opponent's representative Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.2006
WITHDRAWN Deutsche Bahn Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE Opponent's representative Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | 20.02.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.12.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 15.02.2009 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.03.2006 | IT | 29.03.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | ES | 10.07.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/22] | IT | 29.03.2006 | |
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | IT | 29.03.2006 | |
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | DK | 29.06.2006 | |
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 10.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2098374 (BODE & CO GEB) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 1, line 45 - line 68 * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 2, line 25 - line 40 * * page 2, line 57 - line 71 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE19708764 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH) [X] 1 * abstract * |