EP0989709 - Method to transmit Data into a memory of an apparatus in particular, which is connected to a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antonov, Iavor, Dr. Mauerstrasse 68 10117 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Trebisz, Andrezej Waldow Allee 102 10318 Berlin / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 99250334.2 | 22.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998145823 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19845823 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989709 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989709 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989709 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q7/32 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H04L41/083 (EP);
H04Q11/0457 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/13] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/12] |
Former [2003/10] | |||
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Übertragen von Daten in einen Speicher eines insbesondere mit einem Kommunikationsnetz in Verbindung stehenden Gerätes | [2000/13] | English: | Method to transmit Data into a memory of an apparatus in particular, which is connected to a network | [2000/13] | French: | Procédé de transmission de données dans une mémoire d'un appareil, tout particulièrement connecté à un réseau informatique | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.01.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 03.01.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 03.01.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.01.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2295908 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]DE19543843 (ACER PERIPHERALS INC [TW]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0804046 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 14 - line 39 * * abstract * |