EP0930267 - Method of dispensing a beverage having a gas content and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bass Public Limited Company Centrum 100, 1 First Avenue Burton-on-Trent Staffordshire DE14 2WB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Bass Public Limited Company Centrum 100, 1 First Avenue Burton-on-Trent, Staffordshire DE14 2WB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Price, Stephen Geoffrey 50 Hollow Lane, Draycott in the Clay Ashbourne, Derbyshire, DE6 5QH / GB | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300086.8 | 06.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | GB19980000904 | 17.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9800904 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930267 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B67D1/00 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
B67D1/0071 (EP);
B67D1/0058 (EP);
B67D1/0072 (EP);
B67D1/04 (EP);
B67D1/0406 (EP);
B67D2001/0487 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/13] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abgabe eines gasenthaltenden Getränks | [1999/29] | English: | Method of dispensing a beverage having a gas content and apparatus therefor | [1999/29] | French: | Procédé pour distribuer une boisson gazéifiée et appareil à cet effet | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/48] | 02.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR765395 (M. SCHWENDIMANN) [X] 1,4,11 * page 1, line 29 - line 31 * * page 2, line 46 - line 51 * * figure . * [Y] 2,3,5-10,12,13; | [Y]GB2247225 (WHITBREAD & CO LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,3,12,13 * page 1, line 29 - line 31 *; | [Y]EP0683223 (BASS PLC [GB]) [Y] 5-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4597509 (PEREIRA LEROY A [US]) [X] 1,4,11 * column 2, line 8 - line 14 * * column 2, line 27 - line 29 * * column 2, line 36 - line 43 * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR1447034 (WELTY) [X] 1,11,14 * page 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US5565149 (PAGE JOHN K R [GB], et al); | [A]EP0447104 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0683224 (BASS PLC [GB]) | by applicant | US5062548 |