EP0933448 - Improved diffusion aluminide bond coat for a thermal barrier coating system and a method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gupta, Bhupendra Kumar 8113 Startinggate Lane Cincinnati, Ohio / US | 02 /
Mantkowski, Thomas Edward 8204 Indian Trail Drive Madeira, Ohio 45243 / US | 03 /
Das, Nripendra Nath 8168 North Legare Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
Heidorn, Raymond William 5644 Lake Mead Drive Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/18] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [1999/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. Essex House 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300220.3 | 14.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | US19980016975 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: US 16975 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0933448 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933448 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, C23C12/00, C23C12/02, C23C10/52, C23C10/50 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C23C28/324 (EP,US);
C23C10/50 (EP,US);
C23C10/52 (EP,US);
C23C12/00 (EP,US);
C23C12/02 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12549 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/15] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserte Aluminid-Diffusionsverbundschicht für thermische Sperrschichtsysteme und Verfahren dazu | [1999/31] | English: | Improved diffusion aluminide bond coat for a thermal barrier coating system and a method therefor | [1999/31] | French: | Revêtement de liaison amélioré d'aluminure par diffusion pour systèmes à couche barrière thermique et son procédé de fabrication | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2004
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 14.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.08.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.03.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/16] | Appeal following opposition | 16.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0706/07 | 16.04.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.02.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | DE | 01.08.2009 | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/06] | GB | 14.01.2009 | |
DE | 01.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5238752 (DUDERSTADT EDWARD C [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,9-13,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 2, line 31 - line 44 * * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 49 - line 58 * * example 3; claims 1,4,10,12,15,17,18 * [A] 14,15; | [YA]EP0821078 (HOWMET RES CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,5-7,9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 19 * * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 53 - line 58 * * claims 1,8,14-16,18-21 * [A] 2,8,13; | [Y]JPS55113880 ; | [A]EP0532252 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8,13,16 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0845547 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,3-7,9-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 32 * * column 6, line 23 - line 57 * * column 7, line 38 - column 8, line 16 * * column 10, line 42 - line 51 * * claims 1-5,13-15,17,18,20-26 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801202), vol. 004, no. 174, Database accession no. (C - 033), & JP55113880 A 19800902 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1,3-7,9-15,19 * abstract * |