EP0930649 - Heatsink and fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2007/31] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yoshiyuki c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Hirohisa c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Imai, Takahiro c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Meguro, Kiichi c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300277.3 | 15.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | JP19980006238 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: JP 623898 | JP19980216683 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21668398 | JP19980230187 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: JP 23018798 | JP19980230194 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: JP 23019498 | JP19980376395 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: JP 37639598 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0930649 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0930649 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930649 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H01L23/3736 (EP,US);
H01L21/4871 (EP,US);
H01L23/142 (EP,US);
H01L23/3732 (EP,US);
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1423 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249961 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249988 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24999 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/19] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlkörper und seine Herstellung | [1999/29] | English: | Heatsink and fabrication method thereof | [1999/29] | French: | Dissipateur de chaleur et méthode de fabrication associée | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04005284.7 / EP1424729 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0521405 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [DA] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US5324987 (IACOVANGELO CHARLES D [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0717125 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |