EP0932151 - Medium attaching device and disc drive apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oowaki, Hirohiko 1-1-105 Minoshima-4-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi / JP | 02 /
Shiwa, Masayuki 138-2-518 Hiratadai-1-chome Kasuga-shi / JP | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Gray, John James, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Gray, John James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/19] | Gray, John James, et al Fitzpatricks 39 Stukeley Street London WC2B 5LT / GB | ||
Former [1999/30] | Wilson, Peter, et al Fitzpatricks, Cardinal Court, 23 Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300301.1 | 18.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | JP19980013740 | 27.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1374098 | JP19980217242 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21724298 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0932151 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0932151 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/028 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
G11B17/0282 (EP,US);
G11B17/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/19] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für Aufzeichnungsträger und Plattenlaufwerk | [1999/30] | English: | Medium attaching device and disc drive apparatus | [1999/30] | French: | Dispositif de fixation de support d'enregistrement et appareil d'entrainement de disque | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/18] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4390979 (SAITO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 5, line 28 - column 8, line 52 * [A] 3-17; | [XA]JPH07153157 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2 [A] 3-17; | US5774445 [ ] (SAWI KUNIO [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 67 *; | [XA]US5631894 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [HK]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 53 * [A] 3-17; | [XA]US5637200 (TSYMBEROV LEONID [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 41 * [A] 3-17; | [XA]US5166920 (KOGURE TOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 21 * [A] 3-17; | [XA]US2937916 (OTTO HOHNECKER) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 27 * [A] 3-17 |