EP0968796 - A power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Junkers, John K. 8 Stonewall Road Saddle River New Jersey 07458 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Junkers, John K. 8 Stonewall Road Saddle River, New Jersey 07458 / US | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Junkers, John K. 7 Arrowhead Lane Saddle River New Jersey 07540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Hanson, William Bennett, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Hanson, William Bennett, et al Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | ||
Former [2004/23] | Newby, Martin John, et al Bromhead Johnson Kingsbourne House 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/01] | Newby, Martin John J.Y. & G.W. Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300306.0 | 18.01.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | US19980106591 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 106591 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968796 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0968796 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968796 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B25B29/02 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B25B29/02 (EP,US);
B25B21/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Extension states | AL | 29.09.2000 | LT | 29.09.2000 | LV | 29.09.2000 | MK | 29.09.2000 | RO | 29.09.2000 | SI | 29.09.2000 | Title | German: | Angetriebenes Werkzeug | [2000/01] | English: | A power tool | [2000/01] | French: | Outil motorisé | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5499558 (JUNKERS JOHN K [US]) [DX] 1,3,4 * column 2, lines 42-52; figure - * * column 3, lines 13-26 *; | [A]EP0708259 (JUNKERS JOHN K [US]) [A] 1* column 5, lines 48-58; figure - * |