EP0933863 - Electronic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | ||
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | ||
For all designated states Seiko Instruments R&D Center Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utsunomiya, Fumiyasu, Seiko Instr. R&D Center Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Yoshifumi, Seiko Instr. R&D Center Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300629.5 | 28.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19980015395 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1539598 | JP19980027092 | 09.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2709298 | JP19980353087 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35308798 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933863 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933863 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/156 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
G04C10/00 (EP,US);
H02M3/1563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2001/20] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Gerät | [1999/31] | English: | Electronic instrument | [1999/31] | French: | Appareil électronique | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/07] | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US5715465 (SAVAGE JEFF [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5357395 (BISSELL STEVEN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0392017 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4439805 (TARLETON GEORGE K [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-15 * abstract *; | [X]EP0518039 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-15 * abstract *; | [A]US5684384 (BARKAT SHAKIL H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-15 * abstract * |