EP0935928 - Edible material having boiled egg yolk-like mouthfeel and food utilizing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 542 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 542 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagao, Yasue, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd Tsukuba R&D Center, 3, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | 02 /
Uesugi, Shigemi, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd. Tsukuba R&D Center, 3, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | 03 /
Hirotsuka, Motohiko, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd Tsukuba R&D Center, 3, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300764.0 | 02.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | JP19980025991 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2599198 | JP19980046932 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4693298 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0935928 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/32 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
A23J3/16 (EP);
A23L15/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittel mit Eigelb ähnlichem Mundgefühl und dieses enthaltende Nahrungsmittel | [1999/33] | English: | Edible material having boiled egg yolk-like mouthfeel and food utilizing it | [1999/33] | French: | Matière comestible ayant une sensation dans la bouche resemblant au jaune d'oeuf et aliment la contenant | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 18.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4120986 (LYNN CHARLES CARL) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * column 2, lines 19-47; examples 1-137; claims 1-18 * [Y] 5; | [DY]JPH01304866 ; | [A]US3640732 (JOHNSON ERNEST W) [A] 1-12 * example 1; claim 11 *; | [A]EP0578289 (JENNINGS RICHARD ALAN ;HOLSCHER RUDOLPH (US)) [A] 1-12 * example 3; claim 1 * | [X] - SMITH A.K., CIRCLE S.J., Soybeans: Chemistry and Technology, WESTPORT, CONNECTICUT, THE AVI PUBLISHING COMPANY, INC., (1972), XP002100716 [X] 1,2 * page 296 * | [DY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 04, Database accession no. 90-026612, XP002100717 & JPH01304866 A 19891208 (QP CORP) [DY] 5 * abstract * |