EP0936067 - Cylinder cleaning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldwin-Japan Ltd. 2-4-34 Toyo Kohtoh-Ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onuma, Hiraku 18, Utsukushigaoka 1-chome, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Mukae, Tomokatsu 3-2-3-304, Minamisuna, Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Goto, Takayuki 6-1, Oaza Haramachi, Yamakawa-machi Yamato-gun, Fukuoka / JP | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis Edward Evans & Co., Chancery House, 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300875.4 | 05.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | JP19980044417 | 10.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4441798 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936067 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936067 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
B41F35/00 (EP,US);
B41P2235/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Zylindern | [1999/33] | English: | Cylinder cleaning apparatus | [1999/33] | French: | Dispositif pour nettoyer un cylindre | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03021728.5 / EP1378356 | EP03078127.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 04.11.2003 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.12.2003 | SE | 03.03.2004 | ES | 14.03.2004 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/33] | NL | 03.12.2003 | |
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10250046 ; | [DA]JPH06143545 ; | [DA]US4344361 (MACPHEE JOHN, et al) [DA] 1,13* the whole document *; | [A]EP0696504 (BALDWIN NIPPON KK [JP]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 098, no. 014, & JP10250046 A 19980922 (NIPPON BALDWIN KK) [DA] 1,13 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940823), vol. 018, no. 452, Database accession no. (M - 1661), & JP06143545 A 19940524 (NIPPON BALDWIN KK) [DA] 1,13 * abstract * |