EP0938197 - High capacity chirped-pulse wavelength-division multiplexed communication method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boivin, Luc 80-A White Street Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US | 02 /
Knox, Wayne Harvey 165 Crawfords Corner Road Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | 03 /
Nuss, Martin C. 146 Lincoln Avenue Fair Haven, New Jersey 07704 / US | 04 /
Stark, Jason Blain 4 Sunrise Circle Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300951.3 | 09.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | US19980027055 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: US 27055 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938197 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0938197 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/155, H04J14/02 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04B10/505 (EP,US);
H04B10/50595 (EP,US);
H04B10/506 (EP,US);
H04B10/508 (EP,US);
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wellenlängenmultiplexiertes Hochkapazitätsnachrichtenübertragungsverfahren und System mit gechirpten Pulsen | [1999/34] | English: | High capacity chirped-pulse wavelength-division multiplexed communication method and apparatus | [1999/34] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de communication à multiplexage en longeur d'onde de grande capacité avec des impulsions à période modulée | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 25.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0729057 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1,3-8,10-12,14 * page 3, line 1 - line 23 * * page 7, line 26 - line 27 * * page 8, line 10 - line 27 * * page 8, line 46 - line 54 * * page 10, line 51 - page 11, line 18 * * figures 9,10,17,18,24 * [Y] 9; | [PYA]EP0837575 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PY] 9 * Abstract *; page 2, column 2, line 7 - line 9 * * page 2, column 2, line 35 - line 46 * * page 6, column 9, line 31 - line 50 * * figures 1,3,9A * [PA] 1,10; | [DA]US5631758 (KNOX WAYNE H [US], et al) [DA] 1,10 * Abstract * * figures 2,8-10 *; | [A]US5703708 (DAS CHANDAN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * |