EP0962853 - Wearable computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xybernaut Corporation Hyatt Plaza, Suite 550, 12701 Fair Lakes Circle Fairfax Virginia 22033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Xybernaut Corporation Hyatt Plaza, Suite 550, 12701 Fair Lakes Circle Fairfax, Virginia 22033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyosato, Kazuyuki 4-14-22 Nishishiba Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Jenkins, Michael D. 7437 Courtland Circle Manassas, Virginia 22111 / US | 03 /
Newman, Edward G. 8515 Hampton Way Fairfax Station, Virginia 22039 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann & Borchert Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte - European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Postfach 10 12 31 D-80086 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Goode, Ian Roy 22 Great Austins Farnham, Surrey GU9 8JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301007.3 | 11.02.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | US19980092261 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: US 92261 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962853 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962853 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G06F1/203 (EP,US);
G06F1/16 (KR);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] |
Former [2000/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI | ||
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tragbarer Rechner | [1999/49] | English: | Wearable computer | [1999/49] | French: | Ordinateur portatif | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, IE | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0827061 (XYBERNAUT CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,7,9,10,12 * column 5, line 40 - line 46; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9820403 (VIA INC [US]) [A] 1,2* page 12, line 3 - line 30; figure 1 * |